Accounts and annual returns UNION CHURCH, SHEFFIELD

Charity number: 1193249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window