NOORANI INTERNATIONAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Pakistan
Governance
- 15 February 2021: CIO registration
- NIWT (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syed Muhammad Ul-Haq | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Mudassir Anwar | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mohammad Asim Bilal Sharif | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101 | £211 | £3.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £202 | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 March 2025 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 400 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 March 2025 | 400 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2025 | 765 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 March 2025 | 765 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO, WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO BE CARRIED OUT IN LANCASHIRE/GREATER MANCHESTER, GUJARAT AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE ARE: A) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES, SUPPORT, AND ADVICE; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP AN INDIVIDUAL’S CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING DESIGNED TO SUPPORT UPSKILLING, SELF SUFFICIENCY AND ACCESS TO EMPLOYMENT; C) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT, EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, SERVICES AND HEALTH EDUCATION NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; D) THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE; E) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 WALTER STREET
BRIERFIELD
NELSON
BB9 5JB
- Phone:
- 07515425478
- Email:
- noorani48@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window