RIPON CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the preservation, protection & development of Ripon. Make annual awards to encourage high standards in any developments/refurbishments during the preceeding year. Commenting on planning matters relevant to Ripon with a view to promoting high standards in any developments. Educating members & the general public in the geography, history, natural history & general environment of Ripon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 July 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Frederick Wilson | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Thomas Willis | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Alison Brayshaw | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jane Greenwood | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles David Winpenny | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Fraser Hall | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ian Charlton Taylor | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Rachel Mary Wigginton | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Curtis | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Whitehead | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.53k | £2.71k | £1.37k | £1.91k | £1.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.19k | £3.82k | £3.26k | £4.79k | £4.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/01/1986 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2014 as amended on 02 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF RIPON AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RCS
The Workhouse Museum
Allhallowgate
RIPON
North Yorkshire
HG4 1LE
- Phone:
- 01765608320
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window