AL HASEEN

Charity number: 1193380
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Quranic studies classes

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,185
Total expenditure: £14,369

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Pakistan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 February 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Muhammad Sadiq Chair 02 February 2021
None on record
Umer Nazeer Trustee 19 February 2023
None on record
SOMAYYA BIBI Trustee 02 February 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.52k £7.62k £19.18k
Total expenditure £610 £7.89k £14.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 December 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 December 2024 41 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 February 2023 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 February 2023 100 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
118 BOUNDARY ROAD
LONDON
E13 9QG
Phone:
07984588438
Website:

al-haseen.org