AUDREY'S CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of need by providing support and assistance to people living in Derby and the surrounding area who find themselves in a situation needing help with goods and services which they otherwise could not afford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derby City
Governance
- 15 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Briscoe | Chair | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jason Myree | Trustee | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Smith | Trustee | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Earl Richards Michelle Smith Wayne Briscoe Jason Richards | Trustee | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.76k | £8.28k | £11.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.66k | £8.20k | £10.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
A. FOR THE PREVENTION AND OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE LIVING IN THE DERBY AREA WHO FIND THEMSELVES IN A SITUATION OF NEEDING HELP WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. B. TO ACCESS LOCAL BUSINESS AND THE COMMUNITY FOR DONATIONS OF FOOD CLOTHS AND GOODS WHICH WILL THEN BE DELIVERED TO FAMILIES/INDIVIDUALS WHO NEED THEM THIS INCLUDES ALL PEOPLE WHO MAY FIND THEMSELVES EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY FOR A VARIETY OF REASONS. C. RAISE AWARENESS OF OUR COMMON HUMANITY THROUGH SOCIAL, CULTURAL ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 MACAULAY STREET
SINFIN
DERBY
DE24 9HA
- Phone:
- 07583190008
- Email:
- Earlleonrichards@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window