BUSHLEY CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur sport
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Owen Patrick Lewis Evans | Chair | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gyongyi Keen | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Robert Perry | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart William McGhee | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Woodward | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Perry | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Elisabeth Alexia McFadden | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James William McGhee | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | £3.95k | £6.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £822 | £5.66k | £11.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 February 2024 | 412 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF CRICKET BUSHLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF CRICKET.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIARWAYS
THE RAMPINGS
LONGDON
TEWKESBURY
GL20 6AL
- Phone:
- 07891366124
- Email:
- bushleycc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
facebook.com/bushleycc/
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window