FONDATION CHANEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fondation CHANEL aims for all women and adolescent girls to be free to shape their own destinies; it strives to achieve maximum impact by centring the needs of women with overlapping vulnerabilities. It pursues grant-making through the thematic pillars of: (i) safety; (ii) economic and social autonomy; and (iii) climate resilience by partnering with organisation in the UK and internationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£100,519,004
Donations and legacies | £100.52m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£25,082,814
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £25.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £25.08m | |
Retained for future use | £75.44m |
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- China
- Colombia
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- India
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Japan
- Jordan
- Madagascar
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Peru
- Puerto Rico
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Singapore
- South Korea
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Tunisia
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 30 July 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Broderick | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ndidi Nwuneli | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Renaud Bailly | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Latanya Frett | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Wylie | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mabel van Oranje | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yana Peel | Trustee | 02 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Philippe Blondiaux | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.53m | £86.23m | £100.52m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.53m | £12.92m | £25.08m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.53m | £86.23m | £100.52m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.53m | £12.92m | £25.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £208.15k | £78.10k | £85.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £807.27k | £10.93m | £20.34m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £22.37m | £100.28m | £170.57m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £314.99k | £537.39k | £474.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 AUG 0202 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JAN 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A) THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST WOMEN AND GIRLS CAUSED BY DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF SEX, FINANCIAL DISADVANTAGE OR OTHER FORM OF DISADVANTAGE; AND B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FONDATION CHANEL
5 BARLOW PLACE
LONDON
W1J 6DG
- Phone:
- +442039610505
- Email:
- info@fondationchanel.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window