COMPASSION FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Compassion Food Bank is an independent food bank which provides a free emergency food source for people experiencing food poverty in Manchester and also operates a food club providing food parcels at a low cost to the community. We are members of the Independent Food Aid Network (IFAN), the Greater Manchester Centre for Voluntary Organisation (GMCVO) and Manchester Community Central (MACC).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norma Walters | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Christine Edwards | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roselle Burke | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
BAMIDELE ADEBISI | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.57k | £13.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.47k | £15.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 January 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING; SUPPORT, ITEMS, VOUCHERS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS/FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church of God of Prophecy
300 Moss Lane East
Moss Side
Manchester
Greater Manchester
M14 4SS
- Phone:
- 07773119855
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window