FRIENDS OF LAMBETH NURSERY SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Lambeth Nursery Schools charity supports children and families in Lambeth to access effective support with regards to their child's development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lambeth
Governance
- 17 March 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Page | Chair | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Griffiths | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilda McNamara | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING EFFRA EARLY YEARS CENTRE AND CHILDREN'S CENTRE, ETHELRED NURSERY SCHOOL AND CHILDREN’S CENTRE, HOLMEWOOD NURSERY SCHOOL AND TREEHOUSE CHILDREN’S CENTRE, MAYTREE NURSERY SCHOOL AND CHILDREN’S CENTRE AND TRIANGLE NURSERY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES, NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EFFRA NURSERY SCHOOL
35 EFFRA PARADE
LONDON
SW2 1PL
- Phone:
- 02077338425
- Email:
- lpage@trianglenursery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window