JAMIA ISLAMIA (ISLAMIC STUDIES CENTRE) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Islamic Education to meet the modern needs of Muslims. Enrich society through community service and grassroots initiatives. Empower individuals and groups to serve the needs of their own communities. Provide Islamic services to the British Muslims that enhance their lives as British Citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mohammed Mohbeen | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Najeeha Al Azkah Siddiqi | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jalil Ahmed | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
FARJANA HANNAN | Trustee | 04 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr SAFWAN TAYYAB MBCHB | Trustee | 04 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
FARIED CHEDIE | Trustee | 04 December 2016 |
|
|||||
IMRAN KHAN | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Hassan Ali Shah | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR MUJIB AWAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NOORUL AQTAB SIDDIQI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAIZUL AQTAB SIDDIQI | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.85k | £436.22k | £562.50k | £581.79k | £355.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £191.91k | £343.64k | £490.62k | £603.51k | £398.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £411.66k | £435.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £105.16k | £126.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £24.27k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £21.41k | £19.01k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £603.51k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £490.62k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 1985. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO PROMOTE THE DOCUMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MUSLIM CHILDREN AND ADULTS AND THE TEACHING OF ARABIC AND OTHER LANGUAGES AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hijaz College
Watling Street
Nuneaton
CV11 6BE
- Phone:
- 07732038118
- Email:
- info@hijaz.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window