Accounts and annual returns CORLAN DDIWYLLIANT LLANGWM

Charity number: 1193344
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 March 2025 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 March 2025 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 12 September 2024 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 12 September 2024 220 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 April 2023 78 days late Download Open in new window