RICE LANE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The site is 21 acres of woodland and an inner city farm. The site is used extensively for community activities including youth groups, playschemes, arts workshops and large community events. The farm is a working farm with native and rare breeds of cattle, sheep, pigs, goats and poultry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 May 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Elizabeth Dowling | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerry Soul | Trustee | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Edward Jarman | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.72k | £84.90k | £112.69k | £112.68k | £90.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.96k | £72.74k | £102.08k | £96.15k | £108.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.79k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.00k | £24.22k | £73.45k | £10.92k | £28.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 April 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WARBRECK SOUTH DIVISION OF THE WALTON/FAZAKERLEY AREA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOU DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THEINTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOT THE SAID INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WARBRECK SOUTH DIV OF WALTON/FAZAKERLEY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
City Farm
Rawcliffe Road
Liverpool
L9 1AW
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- ricelanecityfarm@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
ricelanecityfarm.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window