SOUTHERN COUNTIES ARCHERY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Administration of coaching and competitions for archers in the Region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Steven Leonard Richard Ellison | Chair | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Fletcher-Campbell | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Kathleen Anne Lipscomb | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Derrick John Lovell MBE | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexander Blair Purser | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert John Beaney | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||
PHILIP RAYMOND WATSON | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.19k | £35.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.09k | £22.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 May 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ARCHERY IN THE SOUTHERN REGIONS OF ENGLAND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF ARCHERY, INCLUDING BY, (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION): ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING WITH THE FORMATION AND MAINTENANCE OF COUNTY ASSOCIATIONS AND AMATEUR ARCHERY CLUBS WITHIN THE REGION, AND ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING COACHING, JUDGING AND OTHER DEVELOPMENT ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS IN THE REGION, INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT OF TRAINING, COACHING AND JUDGING METHODOLOGIES AND TO CONDUCT, SUPPORT AND PARTICIPATE IN EDUCATIONAL, TRAINING AND COMPETITIVE EVENTS AIMED AT DEVELOPING AND IMPROVING THE ARCHERY PERFORMANCE AND STANDARDS OF ITS MEMBERS AND OTHERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
200 Upper Road
Kennington
OXFORD
OX1 5LR
- Phone:
- 01865730467
- Email:
- secretary@scasarchery.org.uk
- Website:
-
scasarchery.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window