Trustees OPERATION REACH

Charity number: 1194403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Eggar Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Qixin Li Trustee 08 January 2025
None on record
Georgina Louise Bartlett Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Christine Van Der Gucht Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Flora Vasey Trustee 16 June 2021
None on record
Leila Jarvis Trustee 02 January 2021
None on record
Rene Campbell Trustee 02 January 2021
None on record