1ST BLACKWATER VALLEY B-P SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Structured progress work and selective badge work relaed to personal physical and mental personal capabilities. Outdoor activities include hiking, camping, expeditions, climbing, caving canoeing, sailing, shooting, abseiling, and competitive sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Llewellyn | Chair | 22 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
Harry Alan Punter | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum Joshua Howarth | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Daren Rippingale | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann YOUNG | Trustee | 22 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Lewis | Trustee | 22 January 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.28k | £9.15k | £8.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.04k | £10.03k | £8.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 06 March 2023 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO DEVELOP GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND CHARACTER AMONG YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE BOTH SELF-RELIANT AND USEFUL TO OTHERS. THIS IS DELIVERED THROUGH PROGRESSIVE TRAINING BASED ON THE PRINCIPLES AND VALUES OF SCOUTING AS LAID DOWN BY LORD BADEN-POWELL AND THE LAW AND PROMISE GIVEN BY HIM IN 'SCOUTING FOR BOYS'. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Forest Close
Staunton
COLEFORD
Gloucestershire
GL16 8PG
- Phone:
- 07545786364
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window