Financial history NORTHERN COUNTIES EVENTIDE HOME LIMITED

Charity number: 517478
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £757.76k £762.29k £762.88k £748.29k £884.03k
Total expenditure £758.35k £729.66k £759.87k £812.11k £810.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £47.27k £16.70k £8.54k £19.60k £48.75k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £710.49k £724.16k £754.34k £728.69k £835.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £21.42k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £45.00k £0 £0 £0 £48.75k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £758.35k £729.66k £759.87k £812.11k £810.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.79k £5.41k £19.44k £21.59k £20.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0