ELYSIUM MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Elysium memorial Foundation charity is to raise enough funds to build a memorial for veterans and their families for those veterans that have taken their own lives, after service. This will be built at the National memorial arboretum, Staffordshire. We also provide veteran to veteran support so that we can and prevent this tragedy from happening in the 1st place.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Alexander Mackenzie | Chair | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David McColl | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Galsworthy Nicol | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/07/2022 | 25/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.68k | £6.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.38k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEED AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO SERVED AS MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS, IN PARTICULAR THOSE EXPERIENCING POOR MENTAL HEALTH, INCLUDING BY REASON OF BEREAVEMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AND BY ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MEMORIAL TO THOSE WHO HAVE DIED BY SUICIDE AFTER HAVING SERVED AS MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 LADYWELL COURT
MELSONBY
RICHMOND
NORTH YORKSHIRE
DL10 5QN
- Phone:
- 07979003049
- Email:
- edwardmackenzie@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window