NER YISRAEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining a place of public worship and advancing religious , educational and charitable programmes and activities promoting the orthodox Jewish faith and lifestyle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 17 February 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerrin Rosenberg | Chair | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE SINT | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
RONALD DAVID GORNEY | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Green | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Flora Meyer | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAINTAINING AND MANAGING THE SYNAGOGUE KNOWN AS 'NER YISRAEL' AS A PLACE OF WORSHIP PUBLIC PRAYER AND RELIGIOUS STUDY AND BY PROVIDING FOR THE RELIGIOUS NEEDS, SPIRITUAL EDUCATION, PASTORAL NEEDS AND WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ner Yisrael
THE CREST
LONDON
NW4 2HY
- Phone:
- 02082026687
- Email:
- admin@neryisrael.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window