GETTOUTUK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity supports those going through get Refusal which is a form of domestic abuse. The charity also provides education to the members of the community that need to be aware of abuse. We assist on the legislation passing Get Refusal as domestic abuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rifka Meyer | Chair | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linzi Pinto | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Chanie Herskovic | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.71k | £16.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £16.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE FUNDAMENTAL HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: • OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; • ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE ADVICE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT TO THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE JEWISH WHO ARE CONFRONTED WITH DIFFICULTIES IN OBTAINING A “GETT” (ALSO GET) OR DECREE OF DIVORCE FROM THEIR SPOUSE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THEIR RELIGIOUS BELIEFS. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND SUFFERING OF JEWISH WOMEN IN NEED OF SUCH RELIEF WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS DUE TO THE REFUSAL OF A JEWISH RELIGIOUS DIVORCE (GETT) BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 DEANS WAY
EDGWARE
HA8 9NH
- Phone:
- 07794742646
- Email:
- gettoutuk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window