15TH COVENTRY (ST PETER'S) SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 517488
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run scouting activities for children aged 6 to 10 1/2 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Total income: £194
Total expenditure: £1,869
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Coventry City
Governance
Registration history:
- 01 May 1986: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.27k | £462 | £347 | £274 | £194 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.94k | £2.42k | £2.15k | £1.73k | £1.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 05 April 2014 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 14 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DESCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window