FITZROY LODGE ABC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fitzroy Lodge is an amatuer boxing club and community gym in Lambeth. It offers facilities to those who wish to learn the craft of boxing or want to imporve their fitness and wellbeing through boxing training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 29 April 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Williamson | Chair | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jolicoeur | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marlon Nkuni | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie-Louisa Parginou | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Reigate | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grant Davis | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HERSCHELL | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sean Oxley | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Newman | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE TURNER | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.56k | £58.12k | £75.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.04k | £32.71k | £55.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 SEP 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN LONDON IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN BOXING, TOGETHER WITH ASSOCIATED FITNESS/GYM ACTIVITIES. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE "FACILITIES" MEANS BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FITZROY LODGE BOXING CLUB
THE ARCHES
180 LAMBETH ROAD
SE1 7JY
- Phone:
- 02079280146
- Email:
- info@fitzroylodge.club
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window