NASIRULAHI-WALI-FATHU GREATER MANCHESTER

Charity Number: 1193901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arabic and Islamic classes for adults & children. Financial Support for members and the community. Monthly visit to hospitals to provide moral support for patients. Provides weekly Spiritual Prayer sessions. Provides General advice and Information e.g. advices from Immigration Experts, Health Care Professionals etc. Organises Social gathering during Islamic festive seasons and events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £43,053
Total expenditure: £75,371

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2021: Standard registration
  • 14 June 2021: Funds received from 1138290 NASIRULAHI-WALI-FATHU GREATER MANCHESTER
  • 23 August 2022: Funds received from 1138290 NASIRULAHI-WALI-FATHU GREATER MANCHESTER
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Billiamin Abiodun Nasser Chair 26 November 2022
None on record
Ajoke Ajelara Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
olasunkanmi mondiat onigbanjo Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
Hakeem Gbajabiamila Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
Tawakalt Olowe Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
Wasiu Adamson Trustee 25 January 2025
None on record
Adewale Hassan Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Rukayat Beecroft Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.12k £63.36k £43.05k
Total expenditure £7.27k £37.00k £75.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 01 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 07 May 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 07 May 2024 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 29 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NGM Islamic Centre
49 Beresford Road
Manchester
M13 0GT
Phone:
07533890206