KHALIFA EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE ASSOCIATION (KESWA)

Charity Number: 517494
Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help the poor and needy, women and children in UK and in India

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £3,941
Total expenditure: £3,301

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City
  • Leicestershire
  • Warwickshire
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 May 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GULAMHUSSAIN KHALIFA Trustee 11 May 2011
None on record
OSMAN YUSUF SHEIKH Trustee
None on record
ABBAS MOHAMED KHALIFA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.32k £30.34k £10.25k £17.11k £3.94k
Total expenditure £3.13k £7.85k £10.62k £13.49k £3.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 933 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2022 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 March 2022 515 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 EDWARD STREET
NUNEATON
CV11 5RH
Phone:
02476743737