SUSSEX OUSE RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The restoration and preservation of appropriate structures on the Sussex River Ouse Navigation. Providing information and education to the general public using the navigation and adjacent footpaths. Maintaining and improving the bio-diversity of the navigation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 May 2022: CIO registration
- SORT (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Alexander Evans | Chair | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Sutton | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Newbury | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION OF STRUCTURES (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO LOCKS, BRIDGES AND WEIRS) ON THE SUSSEX RIVER OUSE NAVIGATION (FROM HAMSEY NEAR LEWES, EAST SUSSEX TO UPPER RYELANDS BRIDGE NEAR BALCOMBE, WEST SUSSEX) WHERE THEIR RESTORATION WOULD BE A BENEFIT TO THE PUBLIC. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION FROM FURTHER DETERIORATION OF STRUCTURES (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO LOCKS, BRIDGES AND WEIRS) ON THE NAVIGATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND USE OF THE SUSSEX OUSE NAVIGATION AND OTHER CANALS AND WATERWAYS. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE SUSSEX RIVER OUSE NAVIGATION BY IMPROVING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
℅ 4 THE SQUARE
HIGH STREET
LEIGH
TONBRIDGE
TN11 8RJ
- Phone:
- 07771930546
- Email:
- info@sort.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window