THE FAMILY CENTRE (DEAF CHILDREN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support, activities, events and courses for deaf children and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 October 2021: CIO registration
- 26 April 2022: Funds received from 1062339 THE FAMILY CENTRE (DEAF CHILDREN)
- FCDC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Curry | Chair | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lawrence | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kaisha Powell | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Samantha Lautieri | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thompson | Trustee | 30 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Evans | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.45k | £85.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.13k | £98.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AND THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AMONG DEAF CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES IN BRISTOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO MAY BE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING DEAF (WHERE DEAF IS DEFINED AS MILD TO PROFOUND HEARING LOSS) BY: • PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, AND GENERAL ADVICE FOR DEAF FAMILIES • PROVIDING SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR DEAF FAMILIES • PROVIDING, OR SUPPORTING ACCESS TO THE PROVISION OF, SERVICES SUPPORTING DEAF FAMILIES, BY WORKING WITH OTHER RELEVANT AGENCIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Family Centre (Deaf Children)
c/o Upper Horfield Primary School
Sheridan Road
BRISTOL
BS7 0PU
- Phone:
- 0117 9030366
- Email:
- admin@fcdc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window