INTERNATIONAL TAMIL EDUCATIONAL CULTURAL SCIENTIFIC DEVELOPMENT FEDERATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INTERNATIONAL TAMIL EDUCATIONAL CULTURAL SCIENTIFIC DEVELOPMENT FEDERATION (ITEC) is an institute that provides and co-ordinates guidance, resources, workshops, courses and events to support the establishment and operation of Tamil supplementary schools, which provides education in Tamil culture, language, arts and heritage, and to act as an accredited examination body for the Tamil language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
Governance
- 16 July 2021: CIO registration
- ITEC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sivasothy Varatharajah | Chair | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Makanish Varatharajah | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mathullan Devasundararajah | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND SUCH OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION AND CO-ORDINATION OF GUIDANCE, RESOURCES, WORKSHOPS, COURSES AND EVENTS TO SUPPORT THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF TAMIL SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS, WHICH PROVIDE EDUCATION IN TAMIL CULTURE, LANGUAGE, ARTS AND HERITAGE, AND TO ACT AS AN ACCREDITED EXAMINATION BODY FOR TAMIL LANGUAGE TEACHING; B) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED TAMIL ORPHANS IN SRI LANKA TO ACCESS EDUCATIONAL TUITION AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES; C) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE CHILDREN FROM ECONOMICALLY AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED REFUGEE TAMIL COMMUNITIES, LIVING OUTSIDE OF SRI LANKA, WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED DUE TO LANGUAGE, CULTURAL AND FINANCIAL BARRIERS TO ACCESS ADDITIONAL EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO HELP IMPROVE THEIR EDUCATIONAL QUALIFICATIONS AND LIFE CHANCES; D) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED TAMIL REFUGEE CHILDREN LIVING IN THE UK TO ATTEND TAMIL SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12
Woodgate House
2 South Bank
SURBITON
Surrey
KT6 6DQ
- Phone:
- +447951992444
- Email:
- info@itectamil.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window