PROJECT RECCE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Project RECCE has created a pathway into the construction industry, for service leavers and veterans, utilising classroom based, on-line learning and work trials, in collaboration with industry partners who can provide sustainable employment opportunities. The programme is complemented with outdoor activities and access to a peer-support community, improving both physical and mental wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 September 2021: CIO registration
- PROJECT RECCE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Frederick Broad | Chair | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karl Alan Gilmore | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Major Paul William Athanassiadis | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kenneth Shenton | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Plowman | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.60k | £146.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.73k | £166.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1.1 PROVIDING MEANINGFUL VOCATIONAL TRAINING, TRANSITIONAL ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PREPARE THEM FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ACROSS THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY; AND 1.2 PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR HEALTH, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION BY ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY PROVIDING; EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO PREPARE FOR A NEW CAREER IN THE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY INCLUDING VOCATIONAL SKILLS; SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE ARMED FORCES COMMUNITY AND CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY. 3. THE RELIEF OF THE MENTAL ILL-HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO ARE FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES IN NEED BY REASON OF TRAUMA EXPERIENCED DURING THEIR MILITARY SERVICE AND TRANSITION TO CIVILIAN SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND PEER-SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chicken Shed
Hillside Farm
Hillend
Werneth Low Road
Romiley
Stockpor
- Phone:
- 01614305050
- Email:
- careers@projectrecce.org
- Website:
-
projectrecce.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window