Accounts and annual returns NUEVA VIDA EN CRISTO

Charity number: 1193741
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 November 2024 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 November 2024 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 July 2024 251 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 08 July 2024 251 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 December 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 December 2022 58 days late Download Open in new window