THE LIMELIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Charity aim is to raise money for conservation projects around the world.we auction football shirts on our website also hotel stays and all football items such as boots gloves tickets etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Costa Rica
- Kenya
- Laos
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew John Brady | Chair | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Whitnall | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Giles Clark | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Eric William Peacock | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £17.85k | £31.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £30.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 April 2024 | 447 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF WILDLIFE, PARTICULARLY IN RESPECT OF ENDANGERED SPECIES. IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CONSERVATION PROJECTS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS DIRECTED TO ENSURING THE SURVIVAL OF ENDANGERED SPECIES, THEIR HABITATS AND ECOSYSTEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 20 Siddel Court
37 Bishops Road
Highgate
London
N6 4DH
- Phone:
- +447980619018
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window