THE RICHARD WHITEHEAD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We believe disabled people should have access to the life-changing power of sport and we place the individual at the centre of our work. We provide access to life-changing support, mentoring, information, advice, equipment and opportunities that will spark a sustained lifetime intervention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PETER FOSBROOK | Chair | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Philip Dixon | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jeremiah | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Gillian Lane | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Clewes | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Fiona Buckle | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Whitaker | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ashton | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Howells | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Emma Naish | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Cox Smyth | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Whitehead MBE | Trustee | 22 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.09k | £97.07k | £197.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.90k | £70.10k | £104.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jun 2021 as amended on 19 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (WHICH INCLUDES PROJECTS, MENTORING AND EQUIPMENT) TO ENCOURAGE PARTICIPATION IN DISABILITY SPORTS IN GENERAL AND TRACK AND FIELD ATHLETICS IN PARTICULAR IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 9Ine Accounting Ltd
76 Bridgford Road
West Bridgford
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 6AX
- Phone:
- 0115 9812333
- Email:
- info@whitehead.foundation
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window