PENRITH AND EDEN DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meets for 2 hours once a month for social time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 12 May 1986: Standard registration
- 23 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £237 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £319 | £1.30k | £0 | £0 | £416 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 22 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 21 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 11 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 15 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED 9TH APRIL 1986.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE LIVING IN EDEN AND IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THIER CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
EDEN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window