ST GILES' MUSIC ACADEMY OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Giles Music Academy seeks to provide music education for young people aged 6 to 18 who reside in Oxfordshire To achieve this the Academy will offer a range of music making activities including singing organ piano and singing tuition music theory tuition for awards through recognised examination boards activities that develop an individual skills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 April 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Elizabeth Whitlock | Chair | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Prozzillo | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Daniel Walters | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Russell | Trustee | 19 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
ST GILES’ MUSIC ACADEMY SEEKS TO PROVIDE MUSIC EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, AGED 6 TO 18 WHO RESIDE IN OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Giles' Church
10 Woodstock Road
Oxford
OX2 6HT
- Phone:
- 01865510460
- Email:
- academy@st-giles-church.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window