THE GODFREY WATKINS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the public benefit by supporting current and former pupils of the King Henry VIII 3-19 School, Abergavenny, in their studies and activities relating to the expressive arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 January 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Catherine Jane Bennee OBE | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Lisle White | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Leighton Mark Martin | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Jones | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £0 | £5.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2023 | 307 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2023 | 307 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING CURRENT AND FORMER PUPILS OF THE KING HENRY VIII SCHOOL ABERGAVENNY IN THEIR STUDIES RELATING TO THE EXPRESSIVE ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
King Henry VIII 3-19 School
Old Hereford Road
Abergavenny
Monmouthshire
NP7 6EP
- Phone:
- 01873 735318
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window