BRANDON AGED PERSONS' HOMES
Charity Number: 517534
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Durham
Governance
Registration history:
- 04 June 1986: Standard registration
- 29 October 2004: Removed
- 29 October 2004: Funds transferred to 222673 DURHAM AGED MINEWORKERS' HOMES ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 30 September 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 2 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE HOMES OF THE CHARITY WHO SHALL BE AGED PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF BRANDON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BRANDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window