DU ALUMNI ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals, organisations; Provides education, advocacy, advice & information; Bursaries, scholarships, grants and other resources for education; Advancement of education and research, talent sharing, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
53 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 21 May 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muhammad Enamul Huq | Chair | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shamima Begum Matin | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Minara Sultana | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Syed Fahim Ahmed | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Md Anwar Khan | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Md Abdul Bhuiyan | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kachi Kabir | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adhir Das | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Tapan Saha | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Ajit Saha | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
ASHRAF ZAMAN | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
SYEDA SAIMA AHMED | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Md Mosaddeque Biswash | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammod Sirajul Chowdhury | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/03/2022 | 15/03/2023 | 15/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £43.49k | £14.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £47.56k | £10.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE UK AND BANGLADESH, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES DETERMINE, INCLUDING BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIP AND OTHER GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS, CHARITIES AND EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS, WHERE THESE ARE NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11-13 Upton Lane
Ground Floor Office
LONDON
E7 9PA
- Phone:
- 07393202021
- Email:
- info@duaauk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window