AL-KAREEM FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. (a) religious education both on-line and on-site, (b) holding prayer meetings, lectures, public celebration of religious festivals and (c) Carrying out outreach work in the local community. 2. The relief of poverty and suffering among victims of natural or other kinds of disaster in particular but not exclusively in UK and Bangladesh by the provision of food, clothes shelter or other means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hussain Syed | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syed Ashad Ahmed | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hafiz Syed Imam Uddin | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Syed Salah Uddin Ahmed | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.62k | £51.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.60k | £51.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC THROUGHOUT THE UK MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF (A) PLACE OF WORSHIP, (B) RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BOTH ON-LINE AND ON-SITE, (C) HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND (D) CARRYING OUT OUTREACH WORK IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN UK AND BANGLADESH BY THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLOTHES SHELTER OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Bradley Stone Road
LONDON
E6 5RH
- Phone:
- 07534919009
- Email:
- Info@alkareem.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window