CARDIFF CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Cardiff Civic Society aims: to promote high standards of planning, architecture and environment affecting the City of Cardiff; to provide education on the environment, history, natural history and architecture; and to secure the preservation, conservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic/public interest in the City of Cardiff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cardiff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 28 May 1986: Standard registration
- CARDIFF 2000 - THE CIVIC SOCIETY FOR CARDIFF (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NERYS LLOYD-PIERCE | Chair | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marguerite Gray | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Eynon | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Tamsin Stirling | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ceri John Williams | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheleagh LLewellyn | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julia Barrell | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR ELAINE DAVEY | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|||||
MARK ETHERIDGE | Trustee | 25 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.23k | £4.17k | £4.25k | £7.19k | £975 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.45k | £13.05k | £549 | £5.75k | £1.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 1983 AS AMENDED 12 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF URBAN PLANNING, ARCHITECTURE, SUSTAINABILITY AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ENVIRONMENT (GEOGRAPHY), HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE AIM OF INSPIRING THE APPRECIATION OF THE RICH CULTURE AND HERITAGE OF THE AREA AND IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF THE ENVIRONMENT. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF CARDIFF
Contact information
- Address:
-
94 RYDER STREET
CARDIFF
CF11 9BU
- Phone:
- 02920224636
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window