INTERNATIONAL NETWORK FOR TRAINING, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FOR YEMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Training and Education of Medical & general healthcare service organistaions and personnel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Yemen
Governance
- 18 January 2022: CIO registration
- 26 November 2024: Funds received from 1171588 PROFESSIONALS FOR YEMEN
- INTERYEM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Thanweer Farquhar | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kaushar Husein Tai | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
DR SHAHID TARIQ | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
DR SHAHEDA AHMED | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN YEMEN, PRIMARILY BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS/PROVIDERS IN AREAS RELATING TO CLINICAL HEALTH IN ORDER TO IMPROVE BASIC HEALTHCARE AND IMPROVE PATIENT OUTCOMES; B) PROVIDING INTERNATIONAL LINKS BETWEEN HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS IN ORDER TO DEVELOP HEALTH SYSTEMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 HADRIAN ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 9QH
- Phone:
- +447434779060
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window