FREE! RECOVERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free! Recovery is a Christian organisation set up to provide people with relief, hope and freedom from the emotional and mental distress of an addictive issue, which is hurting their everyday life; relationships, walk with God, mental and/or physical health. Free! Recovery has created a 10-week course, workshop, and support groups; trains organisations via a training seminar and consultation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 September 2021: CIO registration
- FREE! (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Ottaviani | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Archer | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Emra | Trustee | 03 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Willcox | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.43k | £36.23k | £21.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.53k | £37.02k | £29.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS INCLUDING THE PROMOTION, SAFEGUARDING AND PRESERVATION OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH, BY MEANS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF ACCESSIBLE SUPPORT TO PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING PSYCHOLOGICAL OR EMOTIONAL DISTRESS PRIMARILY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THOSE WHO ARE AFFECTED BY ADDICTIVE ISSUES AND OTHER LIFE CONTROLLING BEHAVIOURS. ALL ACTIVITIES WILL BE CONDUCTED PURSUANT TO A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, DEMONSTRATIVE OF THE CHRISTIAN FOUNDATION OF THE CIO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Brutton Way
CHARD
TA20 2HB
- Phone:
- 07703682080
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window