SURBITON HIGH SCHOOL BOAT CLUB CHARITY

Charity number: 1196187
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The further advancement of education of Pupils at Surbiton High School by providing or assisting in the provision of rowing facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 October 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • SHSBCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEWART WALKER Chair 11 November 2020
None on record
john stephen fitch Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
CEDRIC GEORGE HUBBARD Trustee 18 August 2021
None on record
JOHN WOODMAN Trustee 18 August 2021
None on record
LOLA ESTELLE BLISS ANDERSON Trustee 18 August 2021
None on record
Elspeth Casey Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
REBECCA GLOVER Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2022 01/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 September 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SURBITON HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
13 SURBITON CRESCENT
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
SURREY
KT1 2JT
Phone:
02085465245
Website:

No information available