HINDU SAMAJ (SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds from functions and religious activities to promote and advance Hindu arts and culture through educational classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 25 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SRINIVAS RAVULA | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
VIBHA SHANBHAG | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
HEMI ATHI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr SHIV SHARMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.70k | £23.40k | £16.68k | £23.87k | £23.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.08k | £23.27k | £21.24k | £13.29k | £26.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 February 2025 | 229 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 January 2024 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 February 2023 | 240 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 September 2021 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 July 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 July 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/12/1982 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/1984 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2000 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HINDU FAITH, CULTURE, ARTS AND LANGUAGES AMONG MEMBERS OF THE HINDU COMMUNITY AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND NEIGHBOURING TOWNS (DISTRICTS) HERE AFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2. PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. 3. ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. 4. TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE EXISTING HINDU TEMPLE, THE COMMUNITY AND CULTURAL CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. (1) FOR ALL THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ORGANISATION AND;(2) FOR BRINGING TOGETHER THE STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER AGENCIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THE WIDER HINDU COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND NEIGHBOURING TOWNS (DISTRICTS)
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 BUCKENHAM STREET
SHEFFIELD
S4 7JQ
- Phone:
- 07710827299
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window