CAIRNS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cairns Road Baptist Church's vision is to bring the hope of Jesus to Westbury Park and beyond. As a community of believers we have our hope in Jesus and are committed to love, pray, share, teach, preach, encourage, welcome, and nurture children, young people and adults to be His wholehearted disciples.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 22 December 2021: CIO registration
- 30 October 2023: Funds received from 1162089 CAIRNS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Markelian Mico | Chair | 07 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Eiron Bailey | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Goddard | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Guy Popkin | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Joan Cheesman | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter Trevor Willingham Turnill | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.40k | £190.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.18k | £206.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 22 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. 3.1.2 THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CAIRNS ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH
CAIRNS ROAD
BRISTOL
BS6 7TH
- Phone:
- 01179425669
- Email:
- office@cairnsroad.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window