THE KAYE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to relieve the needs of young adults aged between 19 and 35 in England and Wales who are living with mental, physical or learning disabilities, and by extension their families and carers, in particular but not exclusively by the provision of grants to assist and support in their treatment, care, education, accommodation and recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 May 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR WILLIAM GREENWOOD KAYE | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Pamela Jean Barnes | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Rosalind Pask | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
William James Allison | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £282.82k | £1.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £23.43k | £16.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 APR 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG ADULTS AGED 19 AND OVER IN ENGLAND AND WALES WHO ARE LIVING WITH MENTAL, PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITIES, AND BY EXTENSION THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT IN THEIR TREATMENT, CARE, EDUCATION, ACCOMMODATION AND RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOX 178
20 WINCHCOMBE STREET
CHELTENHAM
20 WINCHCOMBE STREET
GL52 2LY
- Phone:
- 07808890479
- Email:
- thekayecharity@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window