THE LIBERIAN MANDINGO ASSOCIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (LIMAUK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide short-term financial support for individuals who are most in need in the deprived communities. We provide food for members of the disadvantaged communities. We provide scholarship grant for destitute children to help them go to school or advance their studies. We provide counselling & vocational training services for the socially excluded people to help them integrate into society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vafin Sanoh | Chair | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Toure | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuka Ousumane Sheriff | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fatu Bah King | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Osman Dukuly | Trustee | 26 July 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.95k | £10.99k | £6.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.72k | £12.22k | £6.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 19 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘THE OBJECTS’) ARE A) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE REFUGEE COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE REFUGEE COMMUNITY AND OTHERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 2. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE REFUGEE COMMUNITY AND OTHERS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. B) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PEOPLE MOST IN NEED AND WHO LIVE IN ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED PARTS OF LIBERIA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. SUPPLYING THEM WITH FOOD ITEMS, CLOTHING, FOOTWEAR, MEDICAL AID AND OTHER NEEDED HUMANITARIAN AIDS 2. MAKING GRANTS IN THE FORMS OF SCHOLARSHIP TO THE DESTITUTE CHILDREN TO GO SCHOOL OR TO ADVANCE THEIR STUDIES AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS TO SCHOOLS IN DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES IN LIBERIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 SEAFORTH DRIVE
WALTHAM CROSS
EN8 8BU
- Phone:
- 07534027658
- Email:
- info@limauk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window