CHARITIES HR NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to promote improved standards of HR management in national organisations in the not for profit sector. It forwards its aims by providing meetings, resources and networking that enables members to increase their knowledge and aid development whilst sharing information with other members to support good practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 February 2021: CIO registration
- 29 November 2022: Funds received from 1090867 CHARITIES HR NETWORK
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Dicker | Chair | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
WOOJDAN RAZA | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|||||
SARAH LOMAX | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Gareth Elwin | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Gould | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rhian Williams - Cooke | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £29.54k | £41.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £26.59k | £43.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2021 as amended on 06 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION IN AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVED STANDARDS OF HUMAN RESOURCES ("HR") MANAGEMENT IN CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS WITH THE AIM OF INCREASING EMPLOYEE ENGAGEMENT AND THEIR EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY, INLCUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: ACTING AS A REPRESENTATIVE OF CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS IN RELATION TO IMPROVING THE STANDARDS OF HR IN THE SECTOR, AND PROVIDING A NETWORK OF COMMUNICATION, TRAINING SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO FACILITATE THE IMPROVEMENT OF HR MANAGEMENT STANDARDS IN CHARITIES AND NOT FOR PROFIT ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
10 QUEEN STREET PLACE
LONDON
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 07989848086
- Email:
- coordinator@chrn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window