THE HELLENIC INITIATIVE (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to advance and promote the work of the Hellenic Initiative, Inc. of Delaware, USA, to the extent such work is charitable and for the public benefit under the laws of England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Greece
Governance
- 20 October 2021: CIO registration
- THI (UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikos Stathopoulos | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Constantine Michael Logothetis | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Panagiotis Katsampas | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/12/2022 | 21/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.48k | £259.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.48k | £255.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 December 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 December 2022 | 22 February 2024 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE HELLENIC INITIATIVE, INC. OF DELAWARE, USA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Alithea Capital
35 Park Lane
London
W1K 1RB
- Phone:
- 020 3838 9150
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window