TUNBRIDGE WELLS YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHRISTIAN YOUTHWORK IN SCHOOLS, CHURCHES AND WITHIN LOCAL COMMUNITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 15 March 2021: CIO registration
- 17 January 2022: Funds received from 1130355 TUNBRIDGE WELLS YOUTH FOR CHRIST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Joyce BSc MRICS | Chair | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Henry Wentworth Hill | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Dunlop | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Lyell | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Elizabeth Lyell | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Joyce BSc MRICS | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Louise Hinds | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.68k | £69.54k | £85.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.85k | £74.82k | £82.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | N/A | £700 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH APPEARING IN APPENDIX 1 THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND ITS ENVIRONS; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF PROCLAIMING CHRISTIAN MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND ITS ENVIRONS; (C) TO DEMONSTRATE, PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE CHRISTIAN VALUES, INCLUDING DIGNITY, EMPOWERMENT AND PARTNERSHIP TO ALL YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND ITS ENVIRONS; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUPPORT AND MENTORING IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, THROUGH LUNCHTIME AND AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS, STREET BASED YOUTH WORK AND OTHER YOUTH PROVISION TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS, AND THAT THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; (E) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY PROMOTING OVERSEAS SERVICE, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ACTION AND WORKING WITH THOSE AFFECTED, EITHER DIRECTLY OR THROUGH RELEVANT RELIEF AGENCIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 GROSVENOR ROAD
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN1 2AS
- Phone:
- 01892680025
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window