SETTER BRITTANY POINTER RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the charity are to arrange adoptions in the UK for abandoned hunting dogs rescued in Spain. The charity also aims to undertake fundraising efforts to help support our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 May 2021: CIO registration
- SEBPRA (Working name)
- SETTER BRITTANY POINTER RESCUE ASTURIAS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Stainsby | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Mellars | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Barwick | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Hodgkinson | Trustee | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.47k | £135.84k | £118.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.13k | £128.61k | £124.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 260 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 May 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ABANDONED AND FORMER WORKING DOGS IN SPAIN, IN PARTICULAR SETTERS, BRITTANY AND POINTER BREEDS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Setter Brittany Pointer Rescue
PORTLAND HOUSE
BELMONT BUSINESS PARK
DURHAM
DH1 1TW
- Phone:
- 07871 107117
- Email:
- support@sebpra.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window