THE DIAMOND KITE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1193851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Diamond Kite Foundation hopes to provide much needed respite for young carers with a chance of a holiday of a lifetime to Disney World in Florida, USA with other young carers experiencing the same things in their lives, providing an opportunity to make new friends and help build a network of support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024

Total income: £12,560
Total expenditure: £11,510

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marie Carpenter BSc Hons MRICS Chair 19 October 2019
None on record
Lee Hyett-Powell Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
Dean Hyett-Powell Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record
Tracy Carpenter CMIOSH Trustee 19 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £11.21k £8.03k £12.56k
Total expenditure £2.91k £2.86k £11.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2023 23 April 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 23 April 2024 84 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 21 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
253 Wickham Street
WELLING
Kent
DA16 3LS
Phone:
07946273299