CELEBRATE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CELEBRATE is a Catholic ministry, open to all members of the body of Christ, that aims to inspire, equip and connect people of all ages to live an authentic Christian life in the power of the Holy Spirit, in support of the family, to form the next generation and encourage local community. We train leaders, run events, host activities and produce resources that provide faith support nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Vince | Chair | 12 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Michael Leslie Yardley | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Sarita de Kretser | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lucy Sayer | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrew Kennedy | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.24k | £98.25k | £138.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.97k | £108.92k | £117.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN CONFORMITY WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH, MAINLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · ESTABLISHING MINISTRIES AND EVENTS; · PROVIDING EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF FORMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; · PROMOTING UNITY WITHIN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND · PROMOTING THE OUTREACH OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING THROUGH WORK FOR THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARINE HOUSE
151 WESTERN ROAD
HAYWARDS HEATH
WEST SUSSEX
RH16 3LH
- Phone:
- 02392755547
- Email:
- info@celebratetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window